PA HB1039 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-08 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act authorizing certain financial institutions to conduct savings promotion raffles; and providing for enforcement by the Department of Banking and Securities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing certain financial institutions to conduct savings promotion raffles; and providing for enforcement by the Department of Banking and Securities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1039 PN 1203, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-08SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-06-13SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-13SenateReported as committed
2017-05-04SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2017-04-24SenateIn the Senate
2017-04-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2017-04-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-04-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-19HouseSecond consideration
2017-04-18HouseRemoved from table
2017-04-05HouseLaid on the table
2017-04-05HouseFirst consideration
2017-04-05HouseReported as committed
2017-03-31HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1039
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1039&pn=1203
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=04/05/2017&RollCallId=224
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=213
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/24/2017&RollCallId=280
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=285

Bill Comments

feedback