PA HB1039 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in certification of teachers, further providing for certificates qualifying persons to teach.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In certification of teachers, further providing for certificates qualifying persons to teach.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1039 PN 1315, FP (Y: 189 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-20SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2015-05-11SenateIn the Senate
2015-05-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (189-4)
2015-05-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-05-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-05-06HouseSecond consideration
2015-05-05HouseRemoved from table
2015-05-04HouseLaid on the table
2015-05-04HouseFirst consideration
2015-05-04HouseReported as committed
2015-04-20HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1039
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1039&pn=1315
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=05/04/2015&rNbr=286
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=307
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/11/2015&rNbr=337
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=05/04/2015&RollCallId=286
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/11/2015&RollCallId=337

Bill Comments 750

feedback