PA HB103 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Act No. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 980 over the Chartiers Creek in Canonsburg Borough, Washington County, as the Officer Scott L. Bashioum Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 980 over the Chartiers Creek in Canonsburg Borough, Washington County, as the Officer Scott L. Bashioum Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 103 PN 81, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 103 PN 81, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11SenateAct No. 34
2017-10-11SenateApproved by the Governor
2017-10-05SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-10-04SenateSigned in Senate
2017-10-04SenateSigned in House
2017-10-04SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2017-10-03SenateSecond consideration
2017-10-02SenateRemoved from table
2017-06-05SenateLaid on the table
2017-05-10SenateFirst consideration
2017-05-10SenateReported as committed
2017-02-15SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-02-07SenateIn the Senate
2017-02-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2017-02-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-02-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-02-06HouseSecond consideration
2017-01-25HouseRemoved from table
2017-01-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-01-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-01-25HouseReported as committed
2017-01-23HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=103
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0103&pn=0081
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=01/25/2017&RollCallId=8
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=29
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/07/2017&RollCallId=53
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=170
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=281

Bill Comments

feedback