PA HB1028 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in railroads, providing for prohibition on blocking of crossings, for limitation on length of freight or work trains, for authorization to monitor safety practices and operations by collective bargaining representatives, for safe staffing levels for trains or light engines, for wayside detector systems, for study of transportation of hazardous materials or waste and for reporting system for transportation of hazardous materials or waste; and imposing penalties.
Title
In railroads, providing for prohibition on blocking of crossings, for limitation on length of freight or work trains, for authorization to monitor safety practices and operations by collective bargaining representatives, for safe staffing levels for trains or light engines, for wayside detector systems, for study of transportation of hazardous materials or waste and for reporting system for transportation of hazardous materials or waste; and imposing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1028 PN 1361, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 141 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1028 PN 1025, 2023 A701 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1028 PN 1025, 2023 A701, MOTION TO SUSPEND RULES (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1028 PN 1025, 2023 A673 (Y: 71 N: 130 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1028 PN 1025, 2023 A672 (Y: 82 N: 119 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1028 PN 1025, 2023 A671 (Y: 80 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1028 PN 1025, 2023 A550 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Consumer Protection, Technology And Utilities: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1028 PN 1361, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 141 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1028 PN 1025, 2023 A701 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1028 PN 1025, 2023 A701, MOTION TO SUSPEND RULES (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1028 PN 1025, 2023 A673 (Y: 71 N: 130 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1028 PN 1025, 2023 A672 (Y: 82 N: 119 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1028 PN 1025, 2023 A671 (Y: 80 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1028 PN 1025, 2023 A550 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Consumer Protection, Technology And Utilities: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (141-62) |
2023-06-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-05-24 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2023-05-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-05-03 | House | First consideration |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION, TECHNOLOGY AND UTILITIES |