OR SJM1 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to develop mechanisms that provide adequate notice to states in which persons convicted in military courts of sex crimes plan to reside.
Title
Urging Congress to develop mechanisms that provide adequate notice to states in which persons convicted in military courts of sex crimes plan to reside.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2013-05-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-02 | House | Read. Carried by Matthews. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Davis, Lively, Read, Speaker Kotek. |
2013-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-29 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 30, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 29, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 25, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 22, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-04-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-09 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness. |
2013-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Adopted. Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Bates, Johnson, Monroe, Roblan. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted and subsequent referral to Judiciary be rescinded. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness, then Judiciary. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |