OR SCR8 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

In memoriam: Rob Ingram, 1973-2011.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In memoriam: Rob Ingram, 1973-2011.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-06-03SenateFiled With Secretary of State.
2013-05-31SenatePresident signed.
2013-05-30HouseRead. Carried by Frederick. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Gelser; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Thatcher.
2013-05-20HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 30, 2013 Calendar.
2013-05-14HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 20, 2013 Calendar.
2013-05-13HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 14, 2013 Calendar.
2013-05-08HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2013-05-06HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2013-02-27HouseReferred to Rules.
2013-02-20HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2013-02-19SenateFinal reading. Carried by Shields. Adopted. Ayes, 30.
2013-02-14SenateSecond reading.
2013-02-14SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2013-02-13SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2013-02-08SenateReferred to Rules.
2013-02-07SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback