OR SCR14 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors Robin A. Church for her outstanding service to people of Oregon. Recognizes and honors Robin A. Church for her outstanding service to people of Oregon.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Robin A. Church for her outstanding service to people of Oregon.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2023-06-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Knopp. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Hansell. Adopted. Ayes, 23; Absent, 6--Bonham, Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Woods. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |