OR SCR12 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
Pending: House Veterans and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Commemorates Modoc War of 1872-1873 and honors those who lost their lives. Expresses regret over execution of Kintpuash and other Modoc warriors and] for expulsion of Modoc tribe from Oregon.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commemorating Modoc War and expressing regret for expulsion of tribe.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-04-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-04-02SenateFinal reading. Carried by Girod. Adopted. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Heard, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen.
2019-04-01SenateSecond reading.
2019-03-29SenateRecommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-03-27SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-01-22SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback