US HB5887 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend chapter 3 of title 5, United States Code, to improve Government service delivery, and build related capacity for the Federal Government, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government Service Delivery Improvement Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2024-05-21HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2024-05-21HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
2024-05-21HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5887.
2024-05-21HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
2024-05-21HouseMs. Mace moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2024-02-06HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 41 - 0.
2024-02-06HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-10-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
2023-10-03HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback