MI HB5429 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Children: services; court-appointed special advocate program; create. Creates new act.
Title
Children: services; court-appointed special advocate program; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2024-02-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/7/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2024-02-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Christine Morse |
Subjects
Children: child abuse or child neglect
Children: services
Courts: circuit court
Courts: family division
Courts: probate court
Children: services
Courts: circuit court
Courts: family division
Courts: probate court