OR SB998 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes cities to include modifications to system development charges in housing productions strategy. Authorizes cities to include modifications to system development charges in housing productions strategy. Allows Land Conservation and Development Commission to require modifications to charges in compliance order for unsatisfactory progress in implementing strategy. Authorizes local government to exempt affordable housing from system development charges. Becomes operative January 1, 2024. Requires Department of Land Conservation and Development to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly on recommended legislative changes to adopt consolidated infrastructure funding on or before December 15, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to infrastructure; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kayse Jama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |