OR SB998 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that person may not make retail sale of tobacco product or inhalant delivery system at or from premises located in this state unless person sells tobacco product or inhalant delivery system at or from premises that has been registered. Establishes registration program within Department of Revenue. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Directs department to enter into agreement with Oregon Health Authority to effectively administer program. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Modifies laws governing manner in which authority administers and enforces laws and rules governing retail sale of tobacco products and inhalant delivery systems. Preempts local governments from adopting ordinance or rule that provides for regulation of tobacco products or inhalant delivery systems. Grandfathers in existing ordinances and rules. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to public health; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB998 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB998/Introduced |