OR SB966 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Effective date, July 31, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Effective date, July 31, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to adopt standards for types of data collected for all payer, all claims database that are consistent with standards adopted for collection of data on race, ethnicity, language, disability, sexual orientation and gender identity. Requires Oregon Health Authority to adopt standards for types of data collected for all payer, all claims database that are consistent with standards adopted for collection of data on race, ethnicity, language, disability, sexual orientation and gender identity. Allows authority to charge fee for releasing information from database. Removes obsolete provisions related to individual shared responsibility provisions of Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. Modifies membership of Health Insurance Exchange Advisory Committee and sunsets requirement for authority to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly on integration into authority of duties, functions and powers transferred from Department of Consumer and Business Services. Repeals COFA Premium Assistance Program. Replaces provisions related to Health Plan Quality Metrics Committee with provisions creating Metrics and Scoring Committee under Oregon Health Policy Board. Modifies duties of committee. Repeals metrics and scoring subcommittee.] Beginning in reporting year 2025, requires metrics and scoring subcommittee of Health Plan Quality Metrics Committee to select, based on specified criteria, downstream health outcome and quality measures for coordinated care organizations from sets of core quality measures for Medicaid program published by Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and at least four upstream health outcome and quality measures that focus on social determinants of health. Requires Oregon Health Authority to annually update health outcome and quality measures if necessary to conform to latest sets of core quality measures published by Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. Authorizes members of Public Health Benefit Purchasers Committee, Health Care Workforce Committee, Health Plan Quality Metrics Committee, Behavioral Health Committee and metrics and scoring subcommittee who are not members of Oregon Health Policy Board to receive compensation and actual and necessary travel and other expenses as prescribed by Oregon Health Authority by rule. Repeals requirement that initial assessment by coordinated care organization of child in custody of Department of Human Services be performed in accordance with metrics established by metrics and scoring subcommittee. Requires Oregon Health Authority to study coordinated care organization quality incentive program, develop recommendations for changes and report recommendations to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health by September 15, 2024. Permits Oregon Health Authority to reimburse coordinated care organizations for health-related social needs services using methods other than global budgets. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-15 | Senate | Effective date, July 31, 2023. |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Chapter 584, 2023 Laws. |
2023-07-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Valderrama. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 20--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Conrad, Cramer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, Lewis, Mannix, McIntire, Osborne, Owens, Scharf, Smith G, Stout, Wallan; Excused, 6--Diehl, Elmer, Morgan, Nguyen H, Reschke, Wright. |
2023-06-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 23, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-06-22 | House | Second reading. |
2023-06-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-06-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 8--Anderson, Bonham, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |