OR SB964 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date, June 28, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date, June 28, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to child welfare services; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to child welfare services; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Effective date, June 28, 2011. | |
2011-06-30 | Chapter 568, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-06-29 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-23 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-21 | President signed. | |
2011-06-20 | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Hicks, Kennemer; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Krieger, Speaker Roblan. | |
2011-06-17 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-16 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-06-15 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-15 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-06-14 | Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Burdick, Edwards. | |
2011-06-13 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-13 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-08 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-31 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-05-31 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-31 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-19 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-05-06 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-04-20 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-04-13 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-04 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to Health Care, Human Services and Rural Health Policy, then Ways and Means. | |
2011-03-28 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |