OR SB956 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows personal income taxpayers to subtract from taxable income amounts paid as principal of or interest on qualified education loans, if borrower is taxpayer, spouse or dependent of taxpayer. Reduces amount of allowed subtraction by amounts of interest deducted on federal return. Applies to interest paid in tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2019, and before January 1, 2025. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to income tax subtractions for student loan payments; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Sen. Herman Baertschiger [R] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] |
Sen. Dallas Heard [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Alan Olsen [R] | Sen. Jackie Winters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Finance and Revenue, then Ways and Means. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB956 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB956/Introduced |