OR SB954 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to county tax assessment.
Title
Relating to county tax assessment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Effective date, January 1, 2012. | |
2011-06-21 | Chapter 338, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-06-14 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-07 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-02 | President signed. | |
2011-05-31 | Third reading. Carried by Berger. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-05-27 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-26 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-05-23 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-05-10 | Referred to Revenue. | |
2011-05-05 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-05-04 | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Prozanski. | |
2011-05-03 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-03 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-04-27 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-15 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Finance and Revenue. | |
2011-03-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |