OR SB891 | 2021 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Effective date, December 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Effective date, December 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends suspension of termination of residential tenancies for nonpayment of rent for tenants who have applied for emergency rental assistance and provided documentation of application to their landlord on or before June 30, 2022, throughout period that application is pending. Extends suspension of termination of residential tenancies for nonpayment of rent for tenants who have applied for emergency rental assistance and provided documentation of application to their landlord on or before June 30, 2022, throughout period that application is pending. Amends notice provided with eviction summons delivered by clerk. Adds additional requirements for certain rental assistance providers. Extends until October 1, 2022, sunset of safe harbor for tenants who have applied for emergency rental assistance and sunset of changes extending cure period in termination notices for nonpayment of residential rent. Extends eligibility for funding from Housing and Community Services Department for certain landlords experiencing delay in termination for nonpayment. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to residential tenancies; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-17 | Senate | Effective date, December 14, 2021. |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Chapter 1, 2021 Laws. |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-12-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-12-13 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 18--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, George, Hayden, Levy, Lewis, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright; Excused, 5--Goodwin, Scharf, Wilde, Williams, Zika. |
2021-12-13 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2021-12-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to The Second Special Session of 2021. |
2021-12-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Jama. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Boquist, Robinson. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Referred to The Second Special Session of 2021. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |