OR SB885 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, July 15, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, July 15, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends and modifies program limiting canola production in Willamette Valley Protected District. Sunsets program June 30, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to limits on Willamette Valley canola production; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, July 15, 2019. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 559, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Effective date, July 15, 2019. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Chapter 559, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-07-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 15--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Hayden, Lewis, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Greenlick. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 30, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Heard, Knopp, Olsen, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |