OR SB872 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Department of Information Technology. Transfers duties, functions, powers and responsibilities related to information resources, information technology and telecommunications from Oregon Department of Administrative Services to new department. Becomes operative July 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to information technology in state government; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Legislative Information Management and Technology by prior reference and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Legislative Information Management and Technology by prior reference and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Legislative Information Management and Technology by prior reference, then Ways and Means by Order of the President. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Legislative Information Management and Technology by prior and then Ways and Means by order of the President(Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability, then Legislative Information Management and Technology. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |