OR SB831 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands definition of "supervising physician" to include persons licensed to practice osteopathy or podiatry in this state for purpose of supervising physician assistants.
Title
Relating to supervising physicians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 352, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Boone, Piluso; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-04-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |