OR SB830 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Environmental Quality Commission to adopt by rule consolidated permitting program for motorized in-stream placer mining and motorized upland placer mining. Requires adoption of certain rules related to review of applications, issuance of permits and conditions on permits. Requires Department of Environmental Quality and Department of State Lands, and authorizes Department of Environmental Quality and certain other state agencies, to enter memoranda of agreement assigning Department of Environmental Quality duties related to permitting of motorized in-stream placer mining and motorized upland placer mining. Repeals moratorium on mining using motorized equipment on effective date of Act. Requires operating permit to engage in motorized in-stream placer mining or motorized upland placer mining. Prohibits motorized in-stream placer mining or motorized upland placer mining in certain protected areas. Imposes civil penalties of not more than $1,000 per day for violating permit provisions. Punishes violation of permitting provisions by maximum of $2,000 fine. Becomes operative January 2, 2016] 2017. Authorizes Environmental Quality Commission to take certain actions prior to operative date. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to mining; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, but w/amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage but w/amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |