OR SB825 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts Interstate Compact for Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote. Refers Act to people for their approval or rejection at special election held throughout this state on same date as next primary election.
Title
Relating to the Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote; providing that this Act shall be referred to the people for their approval or rejection.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Devlin [D] | Sen. Leslee Beyer [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] |
Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB825 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB825/Introduced |