OR SB816 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies duration of Family Abuse Prevention Act restraining orders . Modifies duration of certain] Family Abuse Prevention Act restraining orders when restrained person requests hearing within relevant time frame]. Declares emergency, effective on passage.].
Title
Relating to the duration of restraining orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2024. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Chapter 140, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-05-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-05-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Breese-Iverson, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-08 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-05-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-04-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-04-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Findley, Gorsek. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Carried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |