OR SB81 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Corrects references for federal antipoverty programs delivered through community action agency network. Corrects references for federal antipoverty programs delivered through community action agency network.
Title
Relating to federal antipoverty programs.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 23; Absent, 4--Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Boquist, Gorsek, Thomsen. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |