OR SB787 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands crime of assault in the third degree to include assault of public transit vehicle operator acting in course of official duty. Expands crime of assault in the third degree to include assault of public transit vehicle operator acting in course of official duty. Punishes by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both. Expands crime of aggravated harassment to include knowing propulsion of bodily fluids at public transit vehicle operator acting in course of official duty. Punishes by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both.
Title
Relating to public transit vehicle operators.
Sponsors
Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] | Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] |
Sen. James Manning [D] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] | Rep. Gregory Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-13 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-03-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Boquist, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Robinson. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Carried over to 03-09 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |