OR SB754 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that operator may require person who engages in sport, fitness or recreational activity in various ways to release operator from claims for ordinary negligence. Provides that operator may require person who engages in sport, fitness or recreational activity in various ways to release operator from claims for ordinary negligence. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to releases of liability; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Woods [D] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Rep. John Lively [D] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] |
Sen. Richard Anderson [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] |
Rep. Ken Helm [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |