OR SB75 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, May 26, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, May 26, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Higher Education Coordinating Commission to use moneys from Oregon Opportunity Grant program to pay for scholarships for children of public safety officers if other sources of money are insufficient to fully fund scholarships. Permits Higher Education Coordinating Commission to use moneys from Oregon Opportunity Grant program to pay for scholarships for children of public safety officers if other sources of money are insufficient to fully fund scholarships. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to financial aid for higher education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, May 26, 2021. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 99, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-19 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Hayden, Ruiz, Sanchez, Smith G. |
2021-05-13 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Education. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |