OR SB746 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Effective date, June 17, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Effective date, June 17, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to child welfare services; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to child welfare services; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Ferrioli [R] | Rep. Wayne Krieger [R] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Rep. Michael Schaufler [D] |
Sen. Jackie Winters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Effective date, June 17, 2011. | |
2011-06-22 | Chapter 430, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-06-17 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-13 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-07 | President signed. | |
2011-06-06 | Third reading. Carried by Gilliam. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Tomei. | |
2011-06-02 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-01 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-31 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-27 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-05-25 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-16 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Human Services. | |
2011-05-03 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-05-02 | Third reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-04-28 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-27 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-04-20 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-04 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Health Care, Human Services and Rural Health Policy. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |