OR SB745 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Human Services to conduct annual in-person case planning with ward 14 years of age or older during which department informs ward that ward is eligible for transition services and provides ward with assistance in accessing transition services, if applicable. Directs Department of Human Services to conduct annual in-person case planning with ward 14 years of age or older during which department informs ward that ward is eligible for transition services and provides ward with assistance in applying for] accessing transition services, if applicable. Directs department to submit annual report on data relating to transition services for wards. Directs department to submit initial report no later than September 15, 2020.] Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department for provision of transition services to wards.
Title
Relating to transition services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, then Ways and Means. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |