OR SB733 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on the Implementation of Electronic Transcripts in High School. Establishes Task Force on the Implementation of Electronic Transcripts in High School. Sunsets December 31, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to electronic transcripts in high school; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB733 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB733/Introduced |