OR SB724 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, June 26, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, June 26, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to establish method for accounting for coordinated care organization's costs in providing innovative, nontraditional health services.
Title
Relating to payments for health services; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Bates [D] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Rep. Tim Freeman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Effective date, June 26, 2013. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Chapter 534, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 30. |
2013-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem, Gilliam. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Bailey. |
2013-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed. |
2013-06-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-04 | House | Third Reading. Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred. |
2013-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-31 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-05-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-01 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2013-04-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 1--Girod; excused, 3--Johnson, Shields, Winters. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |