OR SB698 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs State Board of Pharmacy to adopt rules to require that prescription drugs be labeled in English and other language upon request of practitioner, patient or patient representative. Directs State Board of Pharmacy to adopt rules to require that prescription drugs for specified persons] be labeled or dispensed with informational insert] in English and other language upon request of practitioner, patient or patient representative. Specifies languages other than English to be used on label and insert and allows board to require additional languages.] Allows board to determine prescription drugs for which additional informational insert in English and other language may be included. Requires that labels and informational inserts be available in at least 14 languages other than English. Directs board to update available languages at least once every 10 years. Exempts institutional drug outlets from requirements. Directs board to adopt rules to require pharmacy to post signage regarding patients' right to free, competent oral interpretation and translation services. Becomes operative January 1, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prescription drug labeling; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02SenateEffective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
2019-07-02SenateChapter 465, 2019 Laws.
2019-06-20SenateGovernor signed.
2019-06-14HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-14SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-10SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 23; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen.
2019-06-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 9--Barreto, Bonham, Leif, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith G, Stark, Wallan; Excused, 3--Barker, Boles, Clem.
2019-05-30HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2019 Calendar.
2019-05-29HouseCarried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2019-05-28HouseSecond reading.
2019-05-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2019-05-16HouseWork Session held.
2019-05-09HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Health Care.
2019-04-22HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-04-18SenateThird reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Johnson, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen.
2019-04-17SenateCarried over to 04-18 by unanimous consent.
2019-04-16SenateSecond reading.
2019-04-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2019-04-03SenateWork Session held.
2019-03-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-06SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Health Care.
2019-01-29SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB698
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB698/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB698/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB698/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB698/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB698/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB698/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28828
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=460586
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29530
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=471190
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=473488

Bill Comments

feedback