OR SB68 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes fees related to real estate and escrow activities.
Title
Relating to fees administered by the Real Estate Commissioner.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Chapter 193, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Evans, McLane, Nearman, Noble; Excused, 2--Heard, Williamson. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 10, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-01 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |