OR SB663 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires premises where person makes retail sales of tobacco products and inhalant delivery systems to be licensed by Oregon Liquor Control Commission. Changes governmental framework for conducting public health activities in this state and for providing public health services to residents of this state.] Provides mechanism by which local health departments may implement provisions of Act separately and at different times.] Becomes operative January 1, 2016.] Requires imposition of fees on licensees that are reasonably calculated to pay for administering provisions of Act. Prohibits certain types of retail sales of tobacco products and inhalant delivery systems. Establishes Tobacco Control Fund and continuously appropriates moneys in fund to commission for purposes of administering provisions of Act. Allows vaporizing and aerosolizing of certain inhalants at businesses that are primarily engaged in business of selling inhalant delivery systems. Creates offense of selling tobacco products, tobacco product devices or inhalant delivery systems to person under 21 years of age. Punishes by maximum of $2,000 fine. Raises minimum age at which person may purchase or possess tobacco products and tobacco product devices to 21 years of age. Provides that licensure requirements become operative July 1, 2017. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to public health; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Finance and Revenue. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by order of the President. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Finance and Revenue. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |