OR SB602 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes sunset on requirement that students must receive certain information related to statewide summative assessments. Removes sunset on requirement that students must receive certain information related to statewide summative assessments. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to statewide summative assessments; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Rep. Rick Lewis [R] |
Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, June 23, 2021. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 401, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Education. |
2021-05-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Findley, Girod, Hansell, Kennemer, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Johnson. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |