OR SB6 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Secretary of State's business registry functions; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the Secretary of State's business registry functions; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-05-05 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-05-02 | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-03-08 | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-03-03 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-22 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Business, Transportation and Economic Development, then Ways and Means. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/sb0001.dir/sb0006.intro.html |