OR SB597 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes method by which surplus "kicker" refunds are made to personal income taxpayers from tax credit to refund payment. Applies to biennia beginning on or after July 1, 2015. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to modification of method of return of surplus kicker amounts to individual taxpayers from tax credit to refund payment; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB597 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB597/Introduced |