OR SB582 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes producer responsibility program for packaging, printing and writing paper and food serviceware. Establishes producer responsibility program for packaging, printing and writing paper and food serviceware. Requires producers of covered products to join producer responsibility organization that implements producer responsibility program plan approved by Department of Environmental Quality. Directs department to establish uniform statewide collection list for recyclable materials. Establishes Oregon Recycling System Advisory Council. Establishes Truth in Labeling Task Force. Repeals labeling requirements for rigid plastic bottles and containers. Requires commingled recycling processing facility to obtain disposal site permit. Prohibits delivery of certain recyclable materials to recycling processing facility other than permitted or certified facility. Imposes civil penalty not to exceed $25,000 for each violation of provisions of Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to modernizing Oregon's recycling system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-20SenateEffective date, January 1, 2022.
2021-08-20SenateChapter 681, 2021 Laws.
2021-08-06SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-26HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-26SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-25HouseThird reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 31; Nays, 24--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Clem, Drazan, Evans, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Meek, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Witt, Wright; Excused, 3--Dexter, Smith G, Wilde; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Zika.
2021-06-24HouseRules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-24HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2021-06-24HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-06-23HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-06-23HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-06-23SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard, Thatcher.
2021-06-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 13--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2021-06-22SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-21SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2021-06-18SenateWork Session held.
2021-06-16SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2021-06-16SenateWork Session held.
2021-06-13SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2021-04-16SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2021-04-16SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-04-13SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-08SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-02SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-23SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-16SenatePublic Hearing Cancelled.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Energy and Environment.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB582
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB582/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB582/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB582/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB582/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB582/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB582/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32030
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/33066
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=532899
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=534001

Bill Comments 750

feedback