OR SB581 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Truth in Labeling Task Force. Prohibits sale of products that make deceptive or misleading claims about recyclability. Directs Environmental Quality Commission to adopt rules for products that make claims about recyclability. Permits Department of Environmental Quality or any other person to bring action enforcing prohibition on sale of deceptive or misleading products.] Imposes civil penalty of up to $25,000 per day of violation of prohibition.] Applies to products sold on or after January 1, 2023.] Establishes Truth in Labeling Task Force. Directs task force to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than June 1, 2022. Repeals labeling requirements for rigid plastic bottles and containers. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day after adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to claims about the recyclability of products; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |