OR SB572 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies protective proceedings to permit vulnerable youth guardianships for adults between 18 and 21 years of age who are eligible for special immigrant status and who are unable to be reunified with parent due to abuse, neglect or abandonment that occurred before adult attained 18 years of age. Modifies protective proceedings to permit vulnerable youth guardianships for adults between 18 and 21 years of age who are eligible for special immigrant status and who are unable to be reunified with parent due to abuse, neglect or abandonment that occurred before adult attained 18 years of age. Creates exceptions to certain protective proceeding procedural requirements in vulnerable youth guardianships. Exempts vulnerable youth guardianships from court fees. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to vulnerable youth; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Wagner [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Zach Hudson [D] |
Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 399, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Evans, Nearman. |
2021-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-12 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-05-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-03-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 3--Girod, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 4--Beyer, Boquist, Heard, Johnson. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |