OR SB5541 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective date, July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Youth Authority for certain biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by authority. Limits biennial expenditures by authority from federal funds. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Youth Authority; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateEffective date, July 1, 2019.
2019-06-21SenateChapter 427, 2019 Laws.
2019-06-17SenateGovernor signed.
2019-06-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-10SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-06HouseThird reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Findley, Greenlick, Marsh; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Smith G.
2019-06-05HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-04HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-05-30HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-05-30HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-05-29SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters.
2019-05-28SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-23SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-05-17SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-15SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2019-05-15SenateWork Session held.
2019-04-10SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-07SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-05SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback