OR SB5531 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Effective date, July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Effective date, July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Land Use Board of Appeals for biennial expenses.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Land Use Board of Appeals; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2013. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 448, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bailey. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 19--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Parrish, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Lively; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Garrett, Matthews, Olson. |
2013-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-05 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-05-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 20; nays, 10--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Whitsett. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Carried over to 05-28 by unanimous consent. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |