OR SB5517 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Effective date, July 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Effective date, July 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the financial administration of the Commission on Judicial Fitness and Disability; appropriating money; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Commission on Judicial Fitness and Disability; appropriating money; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Effective date, July 1, 2011. | |
2011-06-21 | Chapter 340, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-06-14 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-08 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-03 | President signed. | |
2011-06-01 | Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Kennemer. | |
2011-05-31 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-27 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-05-23 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-05-23 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-05-19 | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 4--George, Olsen, Starr, Telfer. | |
2011-05-18 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-17 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-05-13 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-04 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-05-04 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-05 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |