OR SB5509 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective date, July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective date, July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Employment Relations Board for biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by board. Limits biennial expenditures by board from moneys received from assessment against state agencies. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Employment Relations Board; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2015. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Chapter 406, 2015 Laws. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Weidner; Excused, 1--Rayfield. |
2015-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-29 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-28 | House | Second reading. |
2015-05-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-05-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-05-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Thomsen; excused, 2--Burdick, Prozanski. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |