OR SB54 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removes provisions of property tax exemption for community solar projects that restrict exemption to proportion owned by residential customers or leased by residential subscribers. Removes provisions of property tax exemption for community solar projects that restrict exemption to proportion owned by residential customers or leased by residential subscribers. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to property tax exemption for community solar projects; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment, then Tax Expenditures. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |