OR SB528 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to protective proceedings. Modifies provisions relating to protective proceedings. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to protective proceedings; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments, (Printed A-Eng. Minority) and request referral be rescinded. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng). |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |