OR SB528 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Transportation to erect and maintain roadside memorial signs for firefighters killed in line of duty. Requires payment of fee before department may erect sign.
Title
Relating to roadside memorial signs.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 298, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed. Ayes, 57; Absent, 1--Findley; Excused, 1--Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Williamson. |
2019-05-29 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-14 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-03-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Carried over to 03-14 by unanimous consent. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |