OR SB526 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows pharmacist or pharmacy technician to transfer drug containing pseudoephedrine without prescription to person who is at least 18 years of age and presents person's valid government-issued photo identification. Allows pharmacist or pharmacy technician to transfer drug containing pseudoephedrine without prescription to person who is at least 18 years of age and presents person's valid government-issued photo identification. Requires pharmacist or pharmacy technician, prior to transfer, to submit specified information into electronic system designed to prevent illegal transfer of drugs containing pseudoephedrine. Requires pharmacist or pharmacy technician to record specified information about transfer of drug containing pseudoephedrine. Specifies maximum amount of pseudoephedrine that person may receive without prescription. Establishes storage requirements for drug containing pseudoephedrine. Clarifies that measure does not apply to drugs transferred pursuant to prescription. Punishes violation by 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to pseudoephedrine; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Girod [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB526 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB526/Introduced |