OR SB517 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Limits credit for payments not made to Department of Justice to current balance owed to obligee when obligee and obligor agree in writing that specific payments were made and should be credited. Authorizes department to adopt rules directing how support payments credited by department are to be applied and, if applicable, disbursed.
Title
Relating to credit for support payments not made to the Department of Justice.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 463, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lininger. Passed.Ayes, 52; Excused, 7--Bentz, Boone, Helm, McLane, Noble, Smith G, Witt; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nathanson. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-31 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-23 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-03-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Girod; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Gelser. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |