OR SB509 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Hearing and Work Session held.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals crime of unlawfully transporting hay.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to unlawfully transporting hay.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-03-15HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2019-03-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-03-07SenateThird reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Johnson, President Courtney, Steiner Hayward, Thomsen.
2019-03-05SenateSecond reading.
2019-03-05SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-02-26SenateWork Session held.
2019-02-18SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback